Takhar, Amandeep (CPSO#: 93368)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
Medical Staff Office
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: (905) 338-4146
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amandeep Takhar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Takhar ( CPSO# 93368 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalger Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDEEP TAKHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKHAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 2013