Takhar, Jatinder (CPSO#: 65759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Jammu University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Mental Health Care Building
Level F3 466
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 455-5110
Fax: (519) 455-2262
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jatinder Takhar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Takhar ( CPSO# 65759 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
Mental Health care Building
Level 3, Room F3-229
550 Wellington Raod
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 455-5110

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph Health Care,London- Mental Health London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JATINDER TAKHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKHAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1997