Takla, Nagwa Albert (CPSO#: 66057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit D
210 Martindale Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 0B2
Phone: (905) 682-5196
Fax: (905) 682-9317
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nagwa Takla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Takla ( CPSO# 66057 )

Business Address:
D - 210 Martindale Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 682-5196

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Egypt

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAGWA ALBERT TAKLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAKLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999