Takrouri, Waddah Rawhi Zaki (CPSO#: 88138)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Feb 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2008 to 23 May 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 24 May 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2009