Tal, David Tucker (CPSO#: 55910)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Yeshiva Univ Albert Einstein Coll of Med, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6770
Fax: (416) 530-6362
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

34 Monkton Avenue
Toronto ON  M8Z 4N2
Canada
Phone: (647) 268-0620
Fax: (647) 348-2345
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

A G E Matters Clinic
34 Monkton Avenue
Toronto ON  M8Z 4N2
Canada
Phone: (647) 268-0620
Fax: (647) 348-2345
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Tal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tal ( CPSO# 55910 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6770

Business Address:
Age Matters Clinic
34 Monkton Avenue
Toronto ON  M8Z 4N2
Phone Number: (647) 268-0620

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID TUCKER TAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1986