Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Talangbayan, Reuel Vergara (CPSO#: 52169)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 22 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Tagalog

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jul 2010