Talballa, Hala Abdalla Hussein (CPSO#: 87889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ahfad University for Women, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1582 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 7Z5
Phone: (613) 7316620
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HALA ABDALLA HUSSEIN TALBALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALBALLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2007 to 11 Feb 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Feb 2008 to 19 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2008 to 19 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Nov 2009 to 20 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2014