Talbot, James Alexander (CPSO#: 55443)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Feb 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Feb 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 17 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES ALEXANDER TALBOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALBOT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Feb 1987