Talbot, Jeanne Davida (CPSO#: 67060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 May 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2211 Riverside Drive
Suite 402
Ottawa ON  K1H7X5
Phone: (613) 820-9931
Fax: (613) 820-9996
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University of Ottawa Institute
of Mental Health Research
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6718
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEANNE DAVIDA TALBOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALBOT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 May 2001