Talbot-Jones, Robert (CPSO#: 32771)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of St. Andrews, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2014