Tallett, John Robert (CPSO#: 28647)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2012