Tallon, Stephen Geraghty (CPSO#: 57113)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1151 Richmond Street
Western University, Health Services
University Community Centre, Room11
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 851 5768
Fax: 519 661 3380
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

640 HYDE PARK ROAD, UNIT 4
London ON  N6H 3S1
Canada
Phone: 519-641-3627
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

355 Wellington Street, Suite 233
London ON  N6A 3N7
Canada
Phone: 519 432 1919 Ext. 223
Fax: 519-432-9529
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen G. Tallon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tallon ( CPSO# 57113 )

Business Address:
1151 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3K7
Phone Number: (519) 661-3030

Business Address:
4 - 640 Hyde Park Road
London ON  N6H 3S1
Phone Number: (519) 641-3627

Business Address:
233 - 355 Wellington Street
London ON  N6A 3N7
Phone Number: (519) 432-1919

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN GERAGHTY TALLON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALLON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1987