Talman, Marianne Ruth (CPSO#: 65195)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
McMaster Wing Room 423
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mitchell and Talman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Mitchell ( CPSO# 68233 )
Dr. M. Talman ( CPSO# 65195 )

Business Address:
206 Locke Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 4B4
Phone Number: (905) 570-0440

Business Address:
McMaster Health Sciences Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
HGH 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIANNE RUTH TALMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993