Talukdar, Chiranjib (CPSO#: 44411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, Burmese, English, French, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Dhaka, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9th Avenue North Children's Clinic
2342-9th Ave N.
Regina SK  S4R 8C5
Phone: (306) 569-1565
Fax: (306) 569-3353

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1972 to 30 Jun 1973
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 04 Aug 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 04 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from August 4, 2017, the following terms, conditions and limitations are
            imposed on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Chiranjib Talukdar in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent Dr. Talukdar has given to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                               UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                            ("Undertaking")

                                                  of

                                        DR. CHIRANJIB TALUKDAR
                                           ("Dr. Talukdar")

                                                  to

                             COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                            (the "College")


            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Talukdar, certificate of registration number 44411, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Talukdar, acknowledge that the College investigated a complaint
                  bearing File Number 102776 (the "Investigation") regarding whether I
                  engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent by practicing
                  outside the scope of my pediatrics practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Talukdar, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Talukdar, undertake that I will restrict my practice to
                        patients aged seventeen (17) years or younger only.
                  
            (6)   Posting a Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Talukdar, undertake that I shall post a sign in the waiting
                        room(s) of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and
                        secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "A."  For further
                        clarity, this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Talukdar must only
                        see patients aged seventeen (17) years or younger. Further
                        information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons
                        of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Talukdar, undertake to post a certified translation(s) in
                        any language(s) in which I provide services, of the sign described
                        in section (6)(a) in the waiting room(s) of all my Practice
                        Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                        set out at Appendix "A." 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Talukdar, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (6)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Talukdar, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of
                        this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I
                        will notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Talukdar, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (6)(b) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in the language(s) described in section (6)(d).
                  
            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Talukdar, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Talukdar, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Talukdar, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Talukdar, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "B" and Appendix "C",
                        respectively.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Talukdar, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I, Dr. Talukdar, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Talukdar, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Talukdar, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (12)  I, Dr. Talukdar, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (13)  I, Dr. Talukdar, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Talukdar, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Talukdar, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                              Talukdar engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                              incompetent by practicing outside the scope of his pediatrics
                              practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Talukdar must
                              restrict his practice to patients aged seventeen (17) years
                              or younger only. 
                  
                              Dr. Talukdar shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting
                              rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
                              "Dr. Talukdar must only see patients aged seventeen (17)
                              years or younger. Further information may be found on the
                              College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                              www.cpso.on.ca".
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Talukdar, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to
                  the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any
                  information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 4, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Chiranjib Talukdar to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 4, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Talukdar engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent by practicing outside the scope of his pediatrics practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Talukdar must restrict his practice to patients aged seventeen (17) years or younger only.

Dr. Talukdar shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Talukdar must only see patients aged seventeen (17) years or younger. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.