Tam, Cherk Shing (CPSO#: 25112)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 04 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 31 May 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004