Tam, David Wing-Yin (CPSO#: 64008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 225
Oakville ON  L6M4J2
Phone: (905) 337-2191
Fax: (905) 337-2300
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tam ( CPSO# 64008 )

Business Address:
225-2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 337-2191

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID WING-YIN TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992