Tam, Diamond Yat Fai (CPSO#: 87388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 20 Jul 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prism Eye Institute
Unit 1
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone: (905) 456-3937
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Prism Eye Institute
Suite 605
7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6V 1B4
Canada
Phone: (905) 456-3937
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

TLC Laser Eye Centers
Suite 101
50 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Mississauga ON  L5B 3C2
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-9562
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diamond Y. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tam ( CPSO# 87388 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Eyecare
Unit 1
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone Number: (905) 820-3937

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 20 Jul 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 19 Jan 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 18 Jul 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Feb 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Diamond  Yat Fai Tam may practise medicine independently in ophthalmology,
            only.