Tam, Emily Josephine Sze-Man (CPSO#: 84532)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit C-120
11 King St W
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Phone: (416) 368-9990
Fax: (416) 479-8688
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

550 University Avenue
Room 10-142
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422 Ext. 3628
Fax: (416) 597-7169
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2401 Yonge Street
LL01
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Canada
Phone: (416) 544-9065
Fax: (416) 479-8688
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

200 Bay Street
LR8
Toronto ON  M5J 2J3
Canada
Phone: (416) 366-9255
Fax: (416) 366-9259
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

10660 Yonge Street
Units 2 & 3
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Canada
Phone: (905) 770-9096
Fax: (905) 770-4703
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emily Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tam ( CPSO# 84532 )

Business Address:
11 King Street West
Suite C-120
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Phone Number: (416) 368-9990

Business Address:
2401 Yonge Street
Suite LL01
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone Number: (416) 544-9065

Business Address:
LR 8
200 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2J3
Phone Number: (416) 366-9255

Business Address:
550 University Avenue
Suite 10-142
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
Suite 2 & 3
10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C9
Phone Number: (905) 770-9096

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY JOSEPHINE SZE-MAN TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 30 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2011