Tam, Emily Wing Yun (CPSO#: 79290)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 May 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 May 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:McGill University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6660
Fax: (416) 813-6334
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY WING YUN TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2012