Tam, James Wing Lai (CPSO#: 61087)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1990


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Boniface General Hospital
409 Tache Avenue
Winnipeg MB  R2H 2A6
Phone: (204) 258-1290
Fax: (204) 233-9162

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 22 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. JAMES WING LAI TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1990