Tam, Larissa Eleanor (CPSO#: 70093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite LL07
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 299-4750
Fax: (416) 299-7595
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Larissa Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tam ( CPSO# 70093 )

Business Address:
LL07 - 4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 299-4750

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LARISSA ELEANOR TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001