Tam, Penny Kar-Bo (CPSO#: 85979)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 25 Feb 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Feb 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2007 to 23 Mar 2007
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 30 Sep 2008
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Oct 2009
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Sep 2010 to 25 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Feb 2011