Tam, Ronald Kwok Hung (CPSO#: 65084)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Emergency Department
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2328
Fax: (613) 738-4852
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200-100 Marie Curie Pvt
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Canada
Phone: (613) 564-3940
Fax: (613) 564-6627
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronald Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tam ( CPSO# 65084 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Emergency Department
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
300 - 100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 19 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD KWOK HUNG TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1992