Tam, Sydney Pak-Chuen (CPSO#: 63601)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: Tam, Simon Pak-Chuen (used until: 01 Aug 2005 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2S5
Phone: (416) 324-4180
Fax: (416) 324-4181
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St.
Markham ON
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7111
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joan Cheng Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cheng ( CPSO# 66459 )
Dr. S. Tam ( CPSO# 63601 )

Business Address:
Markham-Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7111


Corporation Name: Dr. Sydney Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 1 2010


Corporation Name: Dr. Sydney Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Cheng ( CPSO# 66459 )
Dr. S. Tam ( CPSO# 63601 )

Business Address:
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 472-7111

Business Address:
333 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2S5
Phone Number: (416) 324-4180

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYDNEY PAK-CHUEN TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1992