Tam, Thomas Wing Him (CPSO#: 66508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London East Medical Centre
295 Saskatoon Street
London ON  N5W 6A2
Phone: (519) 659-1900
Fax: (519) 659-8575
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Thomas W.H. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tam ( CPSO# 66508 )
Dr. K. Lo ( CPSO# 68834 )

Business Address:
London East Medical Centre
295 Saskatoon Street
London ON  N5W 6A2
Phone Number: (519) 659-1900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS WING HIM TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1995