Tam, William Yu Kay (CPSO#: 63024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Mar 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1412 Winterberry Drive
Burlington ON  L7P4T4
Phone: (905)9238238
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: William Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Tam ( CPSO# 63024 )

Business Address:
1412 Winterberry Drive
Burlington ON  L7P 4T4

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM YU KAY TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1993
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Feb 1993