Tam, Yiu Wing (CPSO#: 31895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Oct 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Hong Kong, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
78 Corporate Drive
Unit 10
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone: (416) 279-0855 Ext. 238
Fax: (416) 279-0857
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tam & Ting Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 5 2017


Corporation Name: Yiu Wing Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Tam ( CPSO# 31895 )

Business Address:
10 - 78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone Number: (416) 279-0855

Business Address:
Bridgepoint Hospital
14 St. Matthews Road
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8252

Business Address:
Rouge Valley
Ajax and Pickering Health Centre Site
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital, General Site
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272


Corporation Name: Dr. Y.W. Tam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Tam ( CPSO# 31895 )

Business Address:
78 Corporate Drive
Unit 10
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone Number: (416) 279-0855

Business Address:
Bridgepoint Hospital
14 St. Matthews Road
Toronto ON  M4M 2B5
Phone Number: (416) 461-8252

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Ajax and Pickering Health Centre Site
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital
General Site
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
East York ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YIU WING TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1980