Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Tamari, Itamar Elimelech (CPSO#: 65505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stonegate Community Health Centre
150 Berry Road
Toronto ON  M8Y 1W3
Phone: (416) 231-7070
Fax: (416) 231-6903
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Jane Street Clinic
662 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M6N 4A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 338-7272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ITAMAR ELIMELECH TAMARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMARI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993