Tamayo Mendoza, Jesus Arturo (CPSO#: 72073)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 01 Mar 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Universidad La Salle Escuela, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jan 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Feb 2000 to 31 Jan 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 27 Apr 2004 to 26 Apr 2005
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jan 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2005