Tambakis, Maria Lynn (CPSO#: 93734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Emergency Department
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4401
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

401 Sunset Ave
Student Health Services
CAW Student Center
Room 242
Windsor ON  N9B3P4
Canada
Phone: 519-973-7002
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
Emergency Department
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Tambakis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tambakis ( CPSO# 93734 )

Business Address:
Hotel-Dieu Grace Hospital
Emergency Department
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9

Business Address:
University of Windsor - Student Health
CAW-242
401 Sunset Avenue
Windsor ON  N9B 3P4
Phone Number: (519) 973-7002

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA LYNN TAMBAKIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMBAKIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012