Tambasco, Domenica (CPSO#: 80340)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Apr 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Naples, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Health Services
214 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z9
Phone: (416) 978-8030
Fax: (416) 971-2089
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Environmental Health Clinic (WCH)
77 Grenville Street
Main floor, Room 107
Toronto ON  M5S 1B3
Canada
Phone: (416) 351-3764
Fax: (416) 323-6130
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOMENICA TAMBASCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMBASCO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 2004 to 16 Jan 2004
Elective Trainee - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 17 Jan 2004 to 01 Feb 2004
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 02 Feb 2004 to 13 Feb 2004
Elective Trainee - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2005