Tamber, Anoo Preet (CPSO#: 78119)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: Nijjer, Anoo Preet (used until: 04 Nov 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 2016 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 27 Jul 2002
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010