Tan, Allan (CPSO#: 79768)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Doctor's Office
345 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3J6
Phone: (416) 515-0590
Fax: (416) 515-8853
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Atrium On Bay
595 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C2
Canada
Phone: (416) 598-1703
Fax: (416) 598-1778
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Tan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 8 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005