Tan, Charles Chu (CPSO#: 65036)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Fukien, Taiwanese

Education:Laval University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview Woods Medical Centre
610 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1J9
Phone: (905) 770-7500
Fax: (905) 737-2383
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles C. Tan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tan ( CPSO# 65036 )

Business Address:
Bayview Woods Medical Centre
610 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1J9
Phone Number: (905) 770-7500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES CHU TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Medical Biochemistry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Medical Biochemistry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993