Tan, Darrell Hoi-San (CPSO#: 77988)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond St.
4CC Room 4-179
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5568
Fax: (416) 864-5310
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto General Hospital
585 University Ave.
13N - 1323
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Canada
Phone: (416) 340-5077
Fax: (416) 340-9105
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Darrell Tan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tan ( CPSO# 77988 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
4CC Room 4-179
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5568

Business Address:
585 University Avenue
Room 13-1323
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-5077

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DARRELL HOI-SAN TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2006