Tan, Elvin Yan-Zhang (CPSO#: 100224)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Active Care Medical Centre
Unit A
1108 Klondike Road
Kanata ON  K2K 0G1
Phone: (613) 254-9777
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University of Ottawa Health Service
300-100 Marie Curie Pvt
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Canada
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Northumberland Hills Hospital - ER
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg, ON
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Canada
Phone: 905-372-6811
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan St N
Renfrew, ON
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elvin Tan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tan ( CPSO# 100224)

Business Address:
Active Care Medical Centre
Unit A
1108 Klondike Road
Ottawa ON  K2K 0G1
Phone Number: (613) 254-9701

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Aug 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELVIN YAN-ZHANG TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2015