Tan, Jacqueline Go (CPSO#: 70889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Other, Tagalog

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Frame Lake Community Health Clinic
312 Old Airport Road
Yellowknife NT  X1A 3T3
Phone: (867) 873-3512

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE GO TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1996 to 30 Nov 1996
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2016