Tan, James (CPSO#: 86820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital site
Dept of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4444
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

600 Sherbourne Street
Suite 504
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-1883
Fax: (416) 447-5917
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Tan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tan ( CPSO# 86820 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital Site
Department of Emergency Medicine
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-4530

Business Address:
Suite 504
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 928-1883

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2010