Tan, Jens Andreas (CPSO#: 76813)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 409
1515 Holcombe Boulevard
Houston TX  77030
United States
Phone: (713) 792-6911

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENS ANDREAS TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2007