Tan, Jerry Kim Leng (CPSO#: 54009)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Walkerville Medical Centre
Suite 300
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 971-8874
Fax: (519) 971-8672
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jerry Tan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Tan ( CPSO# 54009 )

Business Address:
South Walkerville Medical Centre
Suite 300
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 971-8874

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Dermatology Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JERRY KIM LENG TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 1986