Tan, Kennard Eu-Keong (CPSO#: 85856)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jan 2007 to 11 Feb 2007
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2008 to 31 May 2008
Elective Trainee - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 10 May 2010 to 04 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 May 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 2010