Tan, Kim-Weng (CPSO#: 24005)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services 111 St. Regis Street South North York ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 25 Jan 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIM-WENG TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1970