Tan, Lana Suanne (CPSO#: 77989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
298 Lawrence Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2M 1Y4
Phone: (519) 578-9757 Ext. 2
Fax: (519) 578-9750
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tan ( CPSO# 77989 )

Business Address:
298 Lawrence Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2M 1Y4
Phone Number: (519) 578-9757

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LANA SUANNE TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2005