Tan, Lih Yeen (CPSO#: 95111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C
PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIH YEEN TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2017 to 17 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016