Tan, Marilyn Ang (CPSO#: 85626)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the Philippines, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2006 to 23 Nov 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 19 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2008