Tan, Nicholas Boon Jeck (CPSO#: 86019)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Golden Medical Clinic
P O Box 1170
826 - 9th Avenue South
Golden BC  V0A 1H0
Phone: (604) 897-9092
Fax: (250) 344-7620

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS BOON JECK TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2012