Tan, Nigel Shih-Yen (CPSO#: 95782)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville
PO Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nigel S. Tan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tan ( CPSO# 95782 )

Business Address:
Markham Stoufville Hospital
381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIGEL SHIH-YEN TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015