Tan, Patrick Boon-Huat (CPSO#: 77693)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 12
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone: (905) 790-6362
Fax: (905) 790-6612
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Tan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Tan ( CPSO# 77693 )

Business Address:
Unit 12
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 790-6362

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (705) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 02 Oct 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICK BOON-HUAT TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006