Tan, Tracy (CPSO#: 104848)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 22 Nov 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2014 to 19 Oct 2014
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 26 Oct 2015 to 22 Nov 2015
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2015