Tan-Jarvis, Vilma Sarangelo (CPSO#: 68794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Tagalog

Education:Manila Central University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 170
10 Disera Drive
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Phone: (905) 763-6333
Fax: (888) 501-9616
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vilma Tan-Jarvis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tan-Jarvis ( CPSO# 68794 )

Business Address:
Unit 170
10 Disera Drive
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Phone Number: (905) 763-6333

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VILMA SARANGELO TAN-JARVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN-JARVIS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Jul 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Jul 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1997